Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Approved by Governor 06/09/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) McBride, Moore
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Remove Representative McBride as principal House author and substitute with Representative West (Tammy)
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Alonso-Sandoval
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Waldron
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Hefner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Conference granted, naming GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
SCs named Seifried, Pugh, Green, Pemberton, Rader, Hicks
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Alonso-Sandoval, Waldron
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Hefner
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative McBride (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Seifried
|
|
|