Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB322 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2023
Bill March 13, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2023

Amended

Bill April 17, 2023
Bill February 15, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2023
Bill April 17, 2023