Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB34 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 14, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 9, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 20, 2023

Amended

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill February 13, 2023