Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Provenzano
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Naming of Senate conferees rescinded
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Remove as author Senator Daniels; authored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Request for conference and rejection of HAs rescinded
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Menz
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Remove as author Senator Garvin; authored by Senator Daniels
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
SCs named Garvin, Rosino, Haste, Daniels, Treat, Hicks
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Blancett
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Pae
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Provenzano, Menz, Deck, Roe, West (Tammy), Baker, Swope
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Schreiber, Martinez, Fugate
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Stanley
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Hasenbeck (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|