Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB368 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 15, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill March 23, 2023

Amended

Bill April 14, 2023
Bill February 13, 2023