Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB369 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 15, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 21, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 20, 2023

Amended

Bill April 5, 2023
Bill February 20, 2023