Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Approved by Governor 06/07/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 18
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 37 Nays: 5
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Elections and Ethics
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
SCs named Howard, Gollihare, Alvord, Rosino, Kidd, Jech, Boren
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative West (Josh)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 14
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Elections and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Newton (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Howard
|
|
|