Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB377 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 15, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2023

Amended

Bill April 4, 2023
Bill February 15, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 23, 2023