House | 04/05/2023 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 6 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Referred to Finance | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Reported Do Pass Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Tourism and Wildlife | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Withdrawn from Veterans and Military Affairs committee | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Committee then to Finance Committee | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Coleman |