Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Died in conference
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Conference granted, naming GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
SCs named Hamilton, Pugh, Seifried, Daniels, Dossett, Stewart, Woods
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Stark
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 13
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Hardin, Olsen, Gann, Humphrey, West (Rick), Maynard, Kane, Banning, CrosswhiteHader
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Emergency passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Conley (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Burns
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Hamilton
|
|
|