Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB397 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill March 8, 2023

Amended

Bill April 17, 2023
Bill February 22, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 21, 2023