Oklahoma 2023 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB397 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 02/21/2023

                     
 
Req. No. 1856 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 59th Legislature (2023) 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
FOR 
SENATE BILL 397 	By: Hamilton 
 
 
 
 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
 
An Act relating to schools; directing school district 
boards of education and charter school and public 
library governing boards to appoi nt certain committee 
by certain date; requiring certain employee to be 
included on committee; requiring certain inventory to 
be completed by certain date ; directing designati on 
of print and nonprint materials and media ; directing 
school districts and charter schools beg inning on 
certain date to only inc lude certain materials and 
media with certain designations in certain school 
libraries; allowing students access to certain 
materials and media only with certain written 
consent; directing public libraries beginning on 
certain date to place materials and media with 
certain designation in certain section; allowing 
certain individuals access to cer tain materials and 
media only with certain written consent; prohibiting 
school district, charter school, and public libraries 
beginning on certain date from including materials 
and media with certain content; providing for 
codification; providing an effective date; and 
declaring an emergency. 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     NEW LAW     A new section of law to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statu tes as Section 11-203 of Title 70, unless there 
is created a duplication in numb ering, reads as follows:   
 
Req. No. 1856 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
A. By September 1, 2023, each school district board of 
education, charter school governing bo dy, and public library 
governing body shall appoint a committee to conduct an inventory of 
print and nonprint materials and media located in their libraries.  
A library media specialist employed by a school district or charter 
school shall be included on the committee.  The inventory shall be 
completed by July 1, 2024.  Print and nonprint materials and media 
shall be designated with one of the following ratings: 
1.  “Elementary” means the content of the print or nonprint 
material or media is suitable for children enrolled in grades pre-
kindergarten through five in this state; 
2. “Junior high” means the content of the print or nonprint 
material or media may not include material unsuitable for a child 
enrolled in grades six, seven, and eight in this state, and parents 
and legal guardians are e ncouraged to provide guidance to their 
children in selecting print and nonprint materials and media rated 
“junior high”; 
3.  “Under 16” means the content of the print or nonprint 
materials or media may not include material inappropria te for 
children under the age of sixteen (16), and parents and legal 
guardians are urged to provide guidance to their children in 
selecting print and nonprint materials and media rated “under 16”; 
and   
 
Req. No. 1856 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
4.  “Juniors and seniors” means the content of the print or 
nonprint material or media may include some material not suitable 
for minors. 
B.  Beginning July 1, 2024, school districts and charter schools 
shall: 
1.  Include only print and nonprint materials and media 
designated as “elementary” in elementary school libraries serving 
students in grades pre -kindergarten through five; 
2. Include only print and nonprint materials and media 
designated as “elementary” or “junior high” in elementary school 
libraries that serve students in grades pre-kindergarten through 
eight; 
3.  Include only print and nonprint materials and media 
designated as “elementary”, “junior high”, or “under 16” in junior 
high school and high school libraries; and 
4.  Place print and nonprint materials and media designated as 
“juniors and seniors” in a section of the library accessible only to 
librarians, teachers, and other school staff.  Print and nonprint 
materials and media designated as “juniors and seniors” shall only 
be available to a student if he or she has presented a librarian, 
teacher, or other school staff with written consent from a parent or 
legal guardian. 
C.  Beginning July 1, 2024, public libraries shall place print 
and nonprint materials and media designated as “juniors and seniors”   
 
Req. No. 1856 	Page 4  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
in a section of the library accessible only to library staff.  Print 
and nonprint materials and media designated as “juniors and seniors” 
shall only be available to an individual under the age of eighteen 
(18) if he or she has presented library staff with written consent 
from a parent or legal guardian . 
D.  Beginning July 1, 2024, no print or nonprint material or 
media in a school district library, charter school library, or 
public library shall include content that the average person age 
eighteen (18) or older applying contemporary community standards 
would find has a pred ominant tendency to appeal to a prurient 
interest in sex. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective July 1, 2023. 
SECTION 3.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health , or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by reason whe reof this act shall take effect and 
be in full force fro m and after its passage and ap proval. 
 
59-1-1856 EB 2/21/2023 12:54:11 PM