Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Died in conference
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
SCs named Coleman, Thompson (Kristen), Burns, Newhouse, Seifried, Young, Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 13
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Marti (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Coleman
|
|
|