Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB422 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill March 20, 2023

Amended

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill February 28, 2023