House | 04/13/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 4 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Marti (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Garvin |