Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Approved by Governor 06/09/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 2
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Provenzano
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Remove as principal author Representative Sneed and substitute with Representative Miller
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Sneed (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Montgomery
|
|
|