Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB444 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2023

Amended

Bill April 11, 2023
Bill March 2, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 11, 2023
Bill February 21, 2023