House
|
04/13/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Woods
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Wallace, Townley, Pfeiffer, Stark, Lowe (Dick), Archer, Bennett, Moore, Fetgatter, McDugle, McBride, Martinez, Kerbs
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Withdrawn from Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Remove as coauthor Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Dahm
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Paxton
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Daniels
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Rogers
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Coleman
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Murdock
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Young
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Hamilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Green
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Stanley
|
|
|