Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB458 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 7, 2023

Amended

Bill April 14, 2023
Bill February 13, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 9, 2023