Senate | 04/28/2023 | Approved by Governor 04/28/2023 | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | CR; Do Pass Government Modernization and Technology Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization and Technology | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Martinez (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Thompson (Roger) |