House | 04/11/2023 | CR; Do Pass Rural Development Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Rural Development | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 4 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Pae (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Montgomery |