Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB482 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill March 22, 2023

Amended

Bill April 24, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 20, 2023