Senate | 03/02/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Daniels | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Woods | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Lowe (Dick) (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator McCortney | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | First Reading |