Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Approved by Governor 06/06/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Utilities Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Utilities
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Energy and Telecommunications committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Energy and Telecommunications Committee then to Finance Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Hall
|
|
|