Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB523 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/17/2023

                             
 
 
Req. No. 570 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 59th Legislature (2023) 
 
SENATE BILL 523 	By: Pugh 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to school security; making an 
appropriation to the Oklahoma Department of Emergency 
Management for certain purpose; amending 74 O.S. 
2021, Section 51.2b, as amended by Section 5, Chapter 
302, O.S.L. 2022 (74 O.S. Supp. 2022, Section 5 1.2b), 
which relates to the Oklahoma School Securit y Grant 
Program Act; directing awards provi ded after certain 
date to be used for certain purpo ses; providing for 
noncodification; providing an effective date; and 
declaring an emergency. 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE O F OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     NEW LAW     A n ew section of law not to be 
codified in the Oklahom a Statutes reads as follows: 
There is hereby appropriated to the Oklahoma Department of 
Emergency Management from any monies not otherwise approp riated from 
the General Revenue Fund of the State Treasury f or the fiscal year 
ending June 30, 2024, the sum of Fifty Million Dollars 
($50,000,000.00) or so much thereof as may be necessary to be 
deposited in the Oklahoma School Security Revolving Fund created 
pursuant to Section 51.2c of Title 74 of the Oklahoma S tatutes to 
administer the Oklahoma Sc hool Security Grant Program created   
 
 
Req. No. 570 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
pursuant to Section 51.2b of Title 74 of the Oklahoma Statutes and 
provide grants to public schools and private schools serving 
students in grades pre-kindergarten through twelve. 
SECTION 2.     AMENDATORY     74 O.S . 2021, Section 51.2b, as 
amended by Section 5, Chapter 302, O.S.L. 2022 (74 O.S. Supp. 2022, 
Section 51.2b), is amended to read as follows: 
Section 51.2b. A.  This section shall be known and may be cited 
as the “Oklahoma School Security Grant Program Act”. 
B.  The Oklahoma Department of Emergency Management shall 
solicit proposals for and make gra nts for the enhancement of campus 
security at institutions of higher lea rning, technology center 
schools, public schools, and private schools. 
C.  The goals and objectives of the Oklahoma School S ecurity 
Grant Program are to: 
1.  Increase the awareness of the public and educational 
institutions of the ris ks, threats, and vulnerabilities of school 
campuses as well as mitigation strategies; 
2.  Incentivize participation in school security training 
programs designed to assess cam pus risks, threats, and 
vulnerabilities; 
3.  Provide assistance to institutions o f higher learning, 
technology center schools, public schools , and private schools 
initiating or implement ing school security plans, programs, and 
activities; and   
 
 
Req. No. 570 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
4.  Build upon the success of the pilot Educ ation Grant Program 
established by the Oklahoma Of fice of Homeland Secur ity. 
D.  1. The Department shall determine grant project criteria 
and establish a process for the consideration of prop osals.  The 
proposals shall be considered on a statew ide competitive basis among 
peer institutions. 
2.  Oklahoma School Secu rity Grant Program awards funded 
pursuant to Section 1 of this act beginning July 1, 2023, shall be 
used by public schools or private schools serving students in grades 
pre-kindergarten through twel ve for the following purposes : 
a. the salaries and/or benefits of school security 
personnel, 
b. conducting risk and vulnerability ass essments and 
behavioral threat assessments and implementing 
modifications based on assessment results , 
c. security technology, 
d. updating school building security, an d 
e. developing emergency response plans with local law 
enforcement agencies and emergency medical service 
providers. 
E. On or before January 1, 2010, and each year thereafter, the 
Department shall prepare an annual report on the Oklaho ma School 
Security Grant Program and submit the report to the Governor, the   
 
 
Req. No. 570 	Page 4  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
President Pro Tempore of the Senate , and the Speaker of th e House of 
Representatives. 
SECTION 3.  This act shall become effective July 1, 2023. 
SECTION 4.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, he alth, or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by reason whereof thi s act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and after its passage and approval. 
 
59-1-570 EB 1/17/2023 5:05:22 PM