Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB537 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 8, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 27, 2023

Amended

Bill April 6, 2023
Bill February 27, 2023