House | 04/11/2023 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 7 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Treat |