House | 04/04/2023 | CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Insurance | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Sneed (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Montgomery |