Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB541 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 21, 2023

Amended

Bill April 5, 2023
Bill February 15, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 14, 2023