Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Vetoed 06/09/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Munson
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Worthen (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Haste
|
|
|