House | 04/11/2023 | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Sims (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Remove as author Senator Newhouse; authored by Senator Haste | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Newhouse |