Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Filed with Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Veto overridden: Ayes: 91 Nays: 5
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Veto override message received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Measure sent to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Veto overridden: Ayes: 42 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Vetoed 04/28/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Haste
|
|
|