Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB563 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 27, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 24, 2023

Amended

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill February 20, 2023