Senate | 05/02/2023 | Approved by Governor 05/02/2023 | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | CR; Do Pass Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Health Services and Long-Term Care | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Roe (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Montgomery |