Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB571 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 7, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 26, 2023

Amended

Bill April 5, 2023
Bill February 20, 2023