Senate | 05/05/2023 | Approved by Governor 05/05/2023 | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Received from the House | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 2 | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Title restored | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Rader |