Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Conference granted, naming GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
SCs named Hall, Haste, Alvord, Rosino, Matthews, Seifried, Rogers
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 7
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Kerbs (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Hall
|
|
|