Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB622 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2023
Bill March 6, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 24, 2023

Amended

Bill April 18, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023