Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
CCR read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Banking, Financial Services and Pensions
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
SCs named Montgomery, Jett, Prieto, Hamilton, Newhouse, Woods
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Lepak (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Montgomery
|
|
|