Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB632 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2023
Bill March 22, 2023

Amended

Bill April 10, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 23, 2023
Bill February 14, 2023