Senate | 05/05/2023 | Approved by Governor 05/05/2023 | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Received from the House | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Davis | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Marti (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Burns | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Rogers |