House | 04/12/2023 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Tourism Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Tourism | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 7 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Humphrey (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Reported Do Pass Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Burns |