Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB677 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill March 23, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2023

Amended

Bill April 11, 2023
Bill February 22, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 21, 2023