Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB682 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 8, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 25, 2023

Amended

Bill April 11, 2023
Bill February 8, 2023