House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Randleman
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Dugger
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Pae
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Newhouse
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Bashore
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative McDugle
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Burns
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Weaver
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Boren
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Hardin
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Rosecrants
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Standridge
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Woods
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Pemberton
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Hamilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|