House | 04/19/2023 | Motion expired | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Cantrell | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 56 | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | CR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 8 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Cantrell (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Stewart |