House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Rosino |