Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
SCs named Coleman, Bullard, Pederson, Dugger, Garvin, Stephens, Matthews
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 3
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife Committee then to Finance Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Coleman
|
|
|