Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB746 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2023
Bill March 21, 2023

Amended

Bill April 6, 2023
Bill February 28, 2023