Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
CCR read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Government Modernization and Technology
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
SCs named Kirt, Rader, Howard, Murdock, Montgomery, Standridge, Floyd
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Government Modernization and Technology Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Government Modernization and Technology
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Boatman (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Hall
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Kirt
|
|
|